Shakib, Alireza (CPSO#: 92200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National Medical University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Earl Bales Medical Clinic
4256 Bathurst Street
Suite 100
Toronto ON  M3H 5Y8
Phone: (647)352-7188
Fax: (647)352-7190
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alireza Shakib Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shakib ( CPSO# 92200 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5Y8

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALIREZA SHAKIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAKIB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Sep 2009 to 16 Dec 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 07 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2016