Shalabi, Maher Saleh Ali (CPSO#: 86384)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 May 2007 to 19 Aug 2007
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2007 to 19 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2008 to 19 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2011 to 23 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Oct 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2014