Shalaby, Ibrahim Adly Ibrahim (CPSO#: 68796)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joe Arrington Cancer Centre
4101 - 22nd Place
Lubbock TX  79410
United States
Phone: (806) 725-8191
Fax: (806) 723-6033

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New Mexico
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IBRAHIM ADLY IBRAHIM SHALABY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHALABY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1999