Shalay, Katherine Mary (CPSO#: 54745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Turnbull Diagnostic Imaging
170 Simcoe St
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Phone: (705) 742-3639
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pineridge X-Ray
555 George St N
Peterborough ON  K9H 3S1
Canada
Phone: (705) 745-1058
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shalay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Shalay ( CPSO# 54745 )

Business Address:
Turnbull Diagnostic Imaging
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Phone Number: (705) 742-3639

Business Address:
Pineridge X-Ray
555 George Street North
Peterborough ON  K9H 3S1
Phone Number: (705) 745-1058

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE MARY SHALAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHALAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1985