Sham, Yiu Cheung Edward (CPSO#: 69397)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 03 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2005


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Sep 1995
Elective Trainee - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005