Shamas, Mary Elizabeth (CPSO#: 65500)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
527 Causley Street
PO Box 1450
Blind River ON  P0R 1B0
Phone: (705) 356-1666
Fax: (705) 356-2403
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

12A Woodward Avenue
Blind River ON  P0R 1B0
Canada
Phone: (705) 350-2772
Fax: (705) 356-2403
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary Shamas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shamas ( CPSO# 65500 )

Business Address:
12A Woodward
Blind River ON  P0R 1B0
Phone Number: (705) 356-2772

Business Address:
Blind River Family Medical Clinic
527 Causley Street
PO Box 1450
Blind River ON  P0R 1B0
Phone Number: (705) 356-1666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Sault Area Hospitals,Richard's Landing Site Richards Landing
Sault Area Hospitals,Thessalon Site Thessalon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY ELIZABETH SHAMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993