Shamess, Charles Joseph (CPSO#: 25668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact Dynacare at: 613-738-1242.
Date Received: 16 Sep 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 28 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES JOSEPH SHAMESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMESS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1973