Shamisa, Abdalla Rahuma Mabruk (CPSO#: 68700)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
1106 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1C9
Phone: (519) 973-8771
Fax: (519) 973-4690
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Shamisa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shamisa ( CPSO# 68700 )

Business Address:
205 - 1106 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1C9
Phone Number: (519) 973-8771


Corporation Name: Dr. Shamisa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shamisa ( CPSO# 68700 )

Business Address:
1106 Ouellette Avenue
Suite 205
Windsor ON  N9A 1C9
Phone Number: (519) 973-8771

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 08 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDALLA RAHUMA MABRUK SHAMISA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMISA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Mar 1995 to 27 Mar 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 28 Mar 1996 to 27 Mar 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 28 Mar 1997 to 27 Mar 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 28 Mar 1998 to 27 Mar 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 28 Mar 1999 to 27 Mar 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 28 Mar 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2001