Shammas, Amer (CPSO#: 85873)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Damascus, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6065
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 27 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMER SHAMMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMMAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 04 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008