Shammi, Chekkera Motaiya (CPSO#: 61903)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Madras, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores Centre for
Mental Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: (416) 314-2862 Ext. 6070
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHEKKERA MOTAIYA SHAMMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMMI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2009