Shams, Merajuddin (CPSO#: 83196)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kabul University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unimedico Family Practice
Suite 110
955 Major MacKenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (289) 553-3300
Fax: (289) 553-2600
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

9625 Yonge Street. Unit #2
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5T2
Canada
Phone: 905-2377538
Fax: 289-553-2600
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MERAJUDDIN SHAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2007