Shamsah, Mohammed Ali Mohammed (CPSO#: 71794)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000