Shamsian, Elham (CPSO#: 70008)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104, 1929 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Phone: (613) 288-1065
Fax: (613) 907-1712
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Shamsian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Shamsian ( CPSO# 70008 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
1929 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Phone Number: (613) 288-1065

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELHAM SHAMSIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMSIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998