Shanfield, Simon Emerson (CPSO#: 82464)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1076 Goyeau Street
Windsor ON  N9A 1J1
Phone: (519) 946-0556
Fax: (519) 946-0557
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon Shanfield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shanfield ( CPSO# 82464 )

Business Address:
1076 Goyeau Street
Windsor ON  N9A 1J1
Phone Number: (519) 946-0556

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMON EMERSON SHANFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHANFIELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009