Shannon, Janet Lucy (CPSO#: 59552)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 13 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 2002