Shannon, Patrick Thomas (CPSO#: 65573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Pathology
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 596-4200 Ext. 4101
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Neuropathology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK THOMAS SHANNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHANNON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History