Shannon, William Ridley (CPSO#: 68157)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chemong Regional Medical Centre
P.O. Box 330
765 Ward St.
Bridgenorth ON  K0L 1H0
Phone: (705) 292-0905
Fax: (705) 292-8929
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William R. Shannon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Shannon ( CPSO# 68157 )

Business Address:
Chemong Regional Medical Centre
765 Ward Street
PO Box 330
Bridgenorth ON  K0L 1H0
Phone Number: (705) 292-0905

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM RIDLEY SHANNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHANNON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1996