Shantidatt, Shirish Kumar (CPSO#: 67946)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 1997