Shantz, William Peter (CPSO#: 22732)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 11 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Oct 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1970
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 09 Sep 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2007
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 11 Oct 2007

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 Jul 2007
Summary:

 On July 25, 2007, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Shantz committed an act of professional 
 misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee 
 also found that Dr. Shantz is incompetent.

On October 11, 2007, the Discipline Committee ordered 
 that Dr. Shantz’s certificate of registration be revoked.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 09, 2007