Shapero, Gary Alan (CPSO#: 59652)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
7725 Birchmount Road
Markham ON  L3R 9X3
Phone: (905) 475-9700
Fax: (905) 475-5913
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary Shapero Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Shapero ( CPSO# 59652 )

Business Address:
5 - 7725 Birchmount Road
Markham ON  L3R 9X3
Phone Number: (905) 475-9700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY ALAN SHAPERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPERO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1989