Shapira, Stacey Carolyn (CPSO#: 75215)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 450
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 322-7517
Fax: (416) 489-8053
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shapira Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shapira ( CPSO# 75215 )

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 2B8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Business Address:
Suite 450
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone Number: (416) 322-7517

Business Address:
95 Bayly Street West
Suite G02
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 427-3996

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STACEY CAROLYN SHAPIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPIRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2008