Shapiro, Cal Aaron Jules (CPSO#: 98013)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Yukon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016