Shapiro, Colin Michael (CPSO#: 61968)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Youthdale Child And Adolescent
Sleep Centre
227 Victoria St
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone: (416) 703-0505
Fax: (416) 703-0507
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Parry Sound Health Centre
10 James Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 1Z3
Canada
Phone: (705) 746-4540 Ext. 3306
Fax: (705) 773-4087
County: Territorial District of Parry Sound
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C M Shapiro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Shapiro ( CPSO# 61968 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
MP7 Room 421
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5273

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

South Africa
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 24 Apr 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLIN MICHAEL SHAPIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPIRO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2001