Shapiro, Heather Merle (CPSO#: 52409)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Centre for Fertility and
Reproductive Health
250 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4994
Fax: (416) 586-4686
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 27 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER MERLE SHAPIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPIRO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1984