Shapiro, Howard Stanley (CPSO#: 68879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Public Health
5th Floor
277 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W2
Phone: (416) 338-0478
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD STANLEY SHAPIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPIRO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001