Shapiro, Lori Elaine (CPSO#: 60568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
1137 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 3M6
Phone: (905) 695-2020
Fax: (905) 695-3800
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dermatology - M1700
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-4908
Fax: (416) 480-6897
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lori Shapiro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Shapiro ( CPSO# 60568 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
1137 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 3M6
Phone Number: (905) 695-2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORI ELAINE SHAPIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPIRO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Mar 1989 to 05 Apr 1989
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 1989 to 20 Sep 1989
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 1991 to 25 Sep 1991
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1996