Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Shapiro, Stanley Alan (CPSO#: 33588)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Camillus Centre
9 Oakland Blvd
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 2T1
Phone: (705) 461-7703
Fax: (705) 848-0996
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Isenberg Shapiro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shapiro ( CPSO# 33588 )
Dr. J. Isenberg ( CPSO# 60031 )

Business Address:
42 Second Street East
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 1R1
Phone Number: (705) 567-7778

Business Address:
334 Spring Gate Boulevard
Vaughan ON  L4J 3L9

Business Address:
135 Applegrove Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1N2

Business Address:
17 Cedar Street North
Timmins ON  P4N 6H8
Phone Number: (705) 264-2174


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Shapiro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shapiro ( CPSO# 33588 )

Business Address:
Oaks Withdrawl Treatment Centre
Suite 1
9 Oakland Boulevard
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 2T1
Phone Number: (705) 461-7703

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STANLEY ALAN SHAPIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPIRO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1982