Sharad, Sunil (CPSO#: 59047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
570 University Avenue East
Suite 901
Waterloo ON  N2K 4P2
Phone: (519) 578-6099
Fax: (519) 578-5578
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bajaj Sharad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharad ( CPSO# 59047 )
Dr. R. Bajaj ( CPSO# 58331 )

Business Address:
901 - 570 University Avenue East
Waterloo ON  N2K 4P2
Phone Number: (519) 578-6099

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNIL SHARAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Aug 1993
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Nov 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1988