Sharaf, Eman Sayed Mahmood Mohamed (CPSO#: 79619)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 23 Jun 2003 to 28 Jul 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 23 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2004