Sharan, Richa (CPSO#: 57482)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007