Sharan, Sapna (CPSO#: 84623)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Sep 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Jawaharlal Inst Postgraduate Med Educ, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ivey Eye Institute
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 685-8795
Fax: (519) 646-6094
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Health Sciences Centre
750 Commissioners Street
London ON  N6A 4G5
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dave and Sharan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharan ( CPSO# 84623 )
Dr. S. Dave ( CPSO# 83320 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
750 Commissioners Street
London ON  N6A 4G5

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus - Department of Surgery
E2-650 - 800 Commissioners Road East
PO Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8439

Business Address:
Ivey Eye Institute
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
Room B1-531
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 685-8795

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 10 Sep 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 18 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Sapna Sharan may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Ophthalmology,  University  of Western Ontario, in which Dr. Sharan
                        holds an academic appointment  at  the rank of Associate Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Sharan  no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.