Shareefi, Faisal Mustafa Mohammed Al-Tayyeb (CPSO#: 71908)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1998 to 31 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1999 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2000 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002