Sharef, Khairi Milud Omar (CPSO#: 84035)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Feb 2006 to 27 Apr 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 28 Apr 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 05 Feb 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Feb 2009