Shariat, Masoud (CPSO#: 93709)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Isfahan University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 May 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015