Shariati Sarabi, Zhaleh (CPSO#: 78725)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Meshed, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 19 Mar 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2005 to 31 Oct 2006
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2006