Sharif, Sameer (CPSO#: 103327)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 76993
Electoral District: 04

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr. Sameer Sharif shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate
                  medical  education  program  in  which Dr. Sharif is enrolled at McMaster
                  University.

            (2)   In Dr. Sharif's practice in the postgraduate  medical  education program,
                  Dr. Sharif shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or  out-patients of
                  a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the  department
                  where   Dr.   Sharif   is  properly  practising  medicine  and  to  which
                  postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of
                  its program of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In Dr. Sharif's practice  in  the postgraduate medical education program,
                  Dr. Sharif shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr. Sharif may practise:

                  (a)   adult critical care medicine and to the extent of his employment at
                        St.   Joseph's  Healthcare  Hamilton,   while   under   supervision
                        coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and
                  
                  (b)   medicine  in  the  intensive  care  unit  and  to the extent of his
                        employment  at  Hamilton  Health  Sciences  Hamilton,  while  under
                        supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable  to the College;
                        and
                  
                  (c)   medicine in the paediatric intensive care unit and to the extent of
                        his  employment  at  McMaster  Children's  Hospital,  while   under
                        supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
            (5)   In  Dr.  Sharif's practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. Sharif may not
                  charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This certificate  of  registration expires, and Dr. Sharif must thereupon
                  cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education
                  program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when Dr. Sharif is  no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate
                        medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when Dr. Sharif no longer  holds  Canadian  citizenship,  permanent
                        resident  status,  or  a  valid employment authorization under  the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program
                  (7)   This certificate automatically  converts  to a regular Postgraduate
                        Education certificate and Dr.  Sharif must  immediately  cease  all
                        practice  outside the postgraduate medical education program if any
                        one of the following occurs:
                  
                  (a)   the supervisors  identified  in paragraph (4) notify the College of
                        any concerns regarding Dr. Sharif's  practice,  including  but  not
                        limited   to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the supervisors  are  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue to
                        supervise Dr. Sharif's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval  for  Dr.   Sharif  to  engage  in  practice  outside  the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when Dr. Sharif's employment as specified in paragraph (4)  ceases;
                        or
                  
                  (e)   if  Dr.  Sharif  takes  a leave of absence, or transfers to another
                        program,  from  the postgraduate  education  program  specified  in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In  the  event  of  conversion   to   a  regular  Postgraduate  Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7) or expiry  of  the  certificate  under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  Sharif may not  resume  any  practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate medical education  program under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy until Dr. Sharif  applies  for  a new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2017.  In accordance with paragraph
                  6(a),  this certificate of registration expires on June  30,  2018.   All
                  practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice   outside   the  postgraduate  medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.