Shariff, Farhana (CPSO#: 105115)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
Elective Trainee - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Toronto, 11 Dec 2017 to 24 Dec 2017
Elective Trainee - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Dec 2017