Sharir, Sharon (CPSO#: 69232)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone: (416) 630-1212
Fax: (416) 630-2211
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON SHARIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002