Sharkey, Paul Joseph (CPSO#: 32769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone: (519) 742-7424
Fax: (519) 742-9920
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharkey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sharkey ( CPSO# 32769 )

Business Address:
201 - 525 Belmont Street
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone Number: (519) 742-7424

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL JOSEPH SHARKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARKEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Sep 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985