Sharma, Anand Sagar (CPSO#: 27043)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Apr 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Apr 2005

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 02 Dec 2003
Summary:

On December 2, 2003, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sharma had committed acts of 
professional misconduct in that Dr. Sharma engaged in sexual impropriety with two female 
patients in the office; and that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of 
medicine that would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional. 
 
On December 31, 2003, Dr. Sharma appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the 
Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court).  Pursuant to ss.25(1) of the Statutory Powers 
Procedure Act, the decision of the Discipline Committee is stayed pending the outcome of the 
appeal. 
 
On February 27, 2004, the Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty: 
 
1.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Sharma s certificate of registration for a period of six months, 
      to commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar. 
 
2.    The following terms, conditions and limitations are to be imposed on Dr. Sharma s 
      certificate of registration: 
 
      (a)   Dr. Sharma is to attend and successfully complete a suitable course on Boundaries 
            approved by the Registrar before he resumes practice, with proof of successful  
      completion of the course to be provided to the Registrar.  The costs of the course  
      are to be paid by Dr. Sharma. 
 
      (b)   Dr. Sharma will have a female member of a regulated health profession to be in  
      attendance during all examinations of female patients.   That health professional  
      must enter into a monitoring agreement with the College which will include the  
      requirement to report to the College any concerns about Dr. Sharma s behaviour.   
      The costs of the health professional and reporting are to be borne by Dr. Sharma. 
 
            Dr. Sharma will post a sign in his waiting room, in a form and with a content 
            acceptable to the College, to state that there will be a third person present for 
            examination of female patients. 
 
      (d)   Dr. Sharma is to continue counselling and treatment with a psychiatrist acceptable 
            to the College, which may include Dr. L for as long as is deemed necessary by the 
            psychiatrist and that the psychiatrist enter into a written reporting agreement  
      acceptable to the College, which will impose the requirement to report to the  
      College any concerns about Dr. Sharma s behaviour. Dr. Sharma is to pay the  
      costs of such reporting. 
 
3.    Dr. Sharma is to pay costs of these proceedings fixed in the sum of $7,500.00, said 
      amount to be paid to the College within 12 months of his return to practice. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 11 Apr 2005
Hearing Date(s): 23 Jun 2003

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: April 5, 2005
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On April 5, 2005, Dr. Anand Sharma signed an undertaking with the College which states that:

1. Dr. Sharma has permanently resigned his certificate of registration with the College and,

2. In exchange for his compliance with all the terms of the undertaking, the College has agreed to withdraw the allegation that he engaged in sexual impropriety and sexual abuse of patients and committed acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated July 7, 2004, which allegations of professional misconduct are currently pending before the Discipline Committee.

On May 9, 2005, the College withdrew the allegations before the Discipline Committee.