Sharma, Anil Baldev (CPSO#: 31801)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2575 Innes Road
Gloucester ON  K1B 3K1
Phone: (613) 824-1666
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anil B. Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sharma ( CPSO# 31801 )

Business Address:
2575 Innes Road
Gloucester ON  K1B 3K1
Phone Number: (613) 824-1666

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANIL BALDEV SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1980