Sharma, Bharat (CPSO#: 86224)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite LL4
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 503-2842
Fax: (705) 737-2842
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sharma ( CPSO# 86224 )

Business Address:
Suite LL4
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 503-2842

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Colorectal Surgery Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BHARAT SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013