Sharma, Jasdeep Kumar (CPSO#: 59897)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Aug 2002 to 30 Aug 2002
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2006