Sharma, Kamal (CPSO#: 87701)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Nepali

Education:Dalhousie University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Heart Institute
Division of Cardiology
40 Ruskin ave
Ottawa ON  H3A 1A1
Phone: (613) 761-1934
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

566 louise street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 774-2422
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000 Ext. 5555
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamal Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation/Kamal Sharma Medecine Societe Professionelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sharma ( CPSO# 87701 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Heart Institute
Division of Cardiology
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2422

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMAL SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2007