Sharma, Karan (CPSO#: 100220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Alberta, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Infectious Diseases
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 210 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Canada
Phone: (613) 680-9092
Fax: 6136809093
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nigam Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sharma ( CPSO# 100220)
Dr. A. Nigam ( CPSO# 108089)

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
1221 Wellington Street West
Ottawa ON  K1Y 2Z9
Phone Number: (613) 695-1221

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARAN SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2016