Sharma, Kawal Jeet (CPSO#: 42626)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Mahatma Gandhi Memorial Medical College, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 311
200 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 2E6
Phone: (416) 969-4000
Fax: (416) 928-7546
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 211
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Willowdale ON  M2K 2W1
Canada
Phone: (416) 222-5718
Fax: (416) 222-9777
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAWAL JEET SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 18 Feb 1980 to 31 Mar 1980
Other - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Research Fellows - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1998