Sharma, Krishna (CPSO#: 72658)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 729-8262
Fax: (613) 729-7870
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Krishna Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sharma ( CPSO# 72658 )

Business Address:
Carling Respiratory Services
201 - 1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 729-8262

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 17 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISHNA SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002