Sharma, Mouveen (CPSO#: 107879)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2015 to 09 Oct 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2016