Sharma, Mukul (CPSO#: 57320)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences, General
237 Barton St East
DBCVDRI C4-120
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 40527
Fax: (905) 577-1427
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sharma ( CPSO# 57320 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 27 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUKUL SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1992