Sharma, Priyanka (CPSO#: 103662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Center - Medical Arts
400 Burdick Expy E
Minot ND  58702
United States
Phone: 701-857-7383

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Dakota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRIYANKA SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2016